blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1149715

EP1149715 - Air spring installation for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.02.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/15]For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Karthäuser, Klaus
Nussbaumweg 25
71723 Grossbottwar / DE
 [2001/44]
Application number, filing date01110019.526.04.2001
[2001/44]
Priority number, dateDE200012034926.04.2000         Original published format: DE 10020349
[2001/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1149715
Date:31.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1149715
Date:13.04.2005
Language:DE
[2005/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2001
ClassificationIPC:B60G17/052
[2001/44]
CPC:
B60G17/0523 (EP); B60G17/0155 (EP); B60G2300/14 (EP);
B60G2500/204 (EP); B60G2800/012 (EP); B60G2800/24 (EP);
B60G2800/912 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE,   TR [2002/30]
Former [2002/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Former [2001/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Luftfederungsanlage[2001/44]
English:Air spring installation for vehicles[2001/44]
French:Installation de ressort pneumatique pour véhicules[2001/44]
Examination procedure02.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/28]
03.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2005Fee for grant paid
11.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR13.04.2005
GB13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]GB13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
FR30.04.2005
Former [2006/51]GB13.04.2005
TR13.04.2005
Former [2006/13]GB13.04.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS60236817  ;
 [XA]US4238128  (MCKEE LAIRD W [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 59; figure 1; claim - * * column 3, line 35 - line 46 * [A] 3;
 [A]DE19546324  (GRAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,5 * column 4, line 50 - line 60; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]JPS6136007  ;
 [A]EP0779168  (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3815614  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]US4695074  (KOBAYASHI KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 48 - column 9, line 38; figure 4 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860419), vol. 010, no. 105, Database accession no. (M - 471), & JP60236817 A 19851125 (SANWA SEIKI KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860704), vol. 010, no. 191, Database accession no. (M - 495), & JP61036007 A 19860220 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
by applicantDE4327763
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.