blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1149556

EP1149556 - Optical tomograph [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2008
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.07.2008  [2008/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/11]For all designated states
FUJIFILM Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2001/44]For all designated states
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Toida, Masahiro, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
798 Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi
Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP
 [2001/44]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date01110245.625.04.2001
[2001/44]
Priority number, dateJP2000012618026.04.2000         Original published format: JP 2000126180
[2001/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1149556
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1149556
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1149556
Date:15.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2002
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/00
[2001/44]
CPC:
A61B5/0066 (EP,US); A61B5/0073 (EP,US); G01N21/4795 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/22]
Former [2001/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Optischer Tomograph[2001/44]
English:Optical tomograph[2001/44]
French:Tomographe optique[2001/44]
Examination procedure21.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/17]
12.03.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
16.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2007Fee for grant paid
26.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
24.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9946557  (OPTICAL BIOPSY TECHNOLOGIES IN [US]) [X] 1-3,7 * figure 6; claims 23,,22 * * page 1, lines 2,23 * * page 6, line 34 *;
 [Y]US5291267  (SORIN WAYNE V [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * figure 3; claim 1 * * column 4, lines 7-29 *;
 [Y]EP0527265  (CORNING INC [US]) [Y] 4,5 * table 1 *;
 [Y]EP0586713  (NIPPON PETROCHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6 * table 1 *
 [YD]  - HUANG D ET AL, "OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19911122), vol. 254, no. 5035, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1178 - 1181, XP000604667 [YD] 1-7 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1957169
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.