blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1154146 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1154146



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 117
05.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
31.10.2008 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.11.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.10.2007 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
12.10.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 1
08.10.2007 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
08.10.2007 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
05.09.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
05.09.2007 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
05.09.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
05.09.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.09.2007 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
03.07.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
03.07.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
03.07.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
21.03.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
21.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 3
21.03.2007 Description Search / examination 3
21.03.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.03.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.11.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.11.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.11.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.09.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
25.09.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.09.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
04.10.2001 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.07.2001 Drawings Search / examination 1
24.07.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.07.2001 Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
26.04.2001 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.04.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
26.04.2001 Description Search / examination 10
26.04.2001 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.04.2001 Drawings Search / examination 6
26.04.2001 Priority document Search / examination 23
26.04.2001 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6