blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1154146


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.02.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.03.2011  [2011/13]
02.07.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.08.2010  [2010/31]
12.12.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.01.2009  [2009/03]
12.11.2008 No opposition filed within time limit published on  03.12.2008  [2008/49]
23.11.2007 (Expected) grant published on  26.12.2007  [2007/52]
22.11.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.11.2007 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
26.06.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.03.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.03.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
24.11.2006 First examination report
21.11.2006 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.03.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.05.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.10.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
08.10.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
06.06.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  23.07.2003  [2003/30]
23.05.2003 Request for examination filed published on  09.07.2003  [2003/28]
15.05.2003 Renewal fee
21.09.2002 Publication of search report published on  06.11.2002  [2002/45]
28.09.2001 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.11.2001 [2001/46]