blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1154146
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1154146Global Dossier 26.12.2007B1
EP1154146 06.11.2002A3
EP1154146 14.11.2001A2
Priority number Date
US56920600 11.05.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR0101855 18.12.2001A
Priority number Date
US56920600 11.05.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2342551 22.03.2005C
CA2342551 11.11.2001A1
Priority number Date
US56920600 11.05.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE50113408D 07.02.2008D1
Priority number Date
US56920600 11.05.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6345611 12.02.2002B1
Priority number Date
US56920600 11.05.2000