Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1154146

EP1154146 - Heating device in particular for gaseous fuels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.2008
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/52]For all designated states
DEERE & COMPANY
One John Deere Place
Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US
Former [2001/46]For all designated states
DEERE & COMPANY
One John Deere Place
Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hartman, William Lyle
2716 Barton Avenue
Waterloo, IA 50702 / US
02 / Latusek, John Philip
4212 Sterling Lane
Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US
03 / Schindler, Rodney Allen
444 Primrose Drive
Hudson, IA 50643 / US
 [2001/46]
Representative(s)Magin, Ludwig Bernhard
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG
Global Intellectual Property Services
John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/46]Magin, Ludwig Bernhard
Deere & Company European Office Patent Department
68140 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date01110280.326.04.2001
[2001/46]
Priority number, dateUS2000056920611.05.2000         Original published format: US 569206
[2001/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1154146
Date:14.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1154146
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1154146
Date:26.12.2007
Language:DE
[2007/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:F02M31/10
[2001/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2003/30]
Former [2001/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Heizeinrichtung für insbesondere gasförmige Kraftstoffe[2001/46]
English:Heating device in particular for gaseous fuels[2001/46]
French:Dispositif de chauffage, en particulier pour des carburants gazeux[2001/46]
Examination procedure06.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/28]
23.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2007Fee for grant paid
13.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
21.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB26.12.2007
SE27.04.2008
IT30.04.2008
[2011/13]
Former [2010/31]GB26.12.2007
SE27.04.2008
Former [2009/03]GB26.12.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]US6044825  (CARTER STEVEN A [CA], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 6, line 19 - column 10, line 56; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US4648372  (MICHAUD JOCELYN P [CA], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 40; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US4748960  (WOLF GILBERT [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 5, line 32; figure . *;
 [X]US4846137  (RAY DENNIS A [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 20 - column 6, line 58; figures 1-10 *;
 [X]US4395995  (CRAIN THERON H [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 1 - column 7, line 59; figures 1-5 *
by applicantUS5483943