EP1162260 - Cofermentation plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U.T.S. Umwelt-Technik-Süd GmbH Steinkirchen 9 84419 Obertaufkirchen / DE | [2001/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bürger, Adam Schulweg 1 84405 Grüntegernbach / DE | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Neubauer, Hans-Jürgen Neubauer - Liebl Patentanwälte Fauststrasse 30 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Neubauer, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Neubauer - Liebl Patentanwälte Fauststrasse 30 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 01110422.1 | 27.04.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | DE2000122056 | 06.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10022056 | [2001/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162260 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162260 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/107 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
C12M21/04 (EP);
C12M23/36 (EP);
C12M27/06 (EP);
C12M33/16 (EP);
C12M43/08 (EP);
C12M45/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/42] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kofermentationsanlage | [2001/50] | English: | Cofermentation plant | [2001/50] | French: | Installation de cofermentation | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/21] | 23.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19617734 (AVA HUEP GMBH U CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3202084 (DOUGLAS HALE, et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 4, line 3 - line 11 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5248602 (SCHMID WALTER [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0374708 (PROBST JOSEF) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19809299 (GANTEFORT [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |