Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1160065

EP1160065 - Method and apparatus for producing a socket pipe of a compactable material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut für Fertigteiltechnik und Fertigbau Weimar e.V.
Cranachstrasse 46
99423 Weimar / DE
[2006/24]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Institut für Fertigteiltechnik und Fertigbau Weimar e.V.
Cranachstrasse 46
99423 Weimar / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kuch, Helmut
Max-Liebermann-Strasse 24
99425 Weimar / DE
02 / Schwabe, Jörg-Henry
Überm Gänseholze 19
99427 Weimar / DE
03 / Benzin, Torsten
Zum Sommerberg 5
07778 Tautenburg / DE
 [2002/01]
Former [2001/49]01 / Kuch, Helmut
Max-Liebermann-Strasse 24
99425 Weimar / DE
02 / Schwabe, Jörg-Henry
Überm Gänseholze 19
99427 Weimar / DE
03 / Benzin, Torsten
Posewitz 1
07774 Camburg / DE
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Sellierstrasse 1
07745 Jena / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/03]Geyer, Fehners & Partner
Patentanwälte Sellierstrasse 1
07745 Jena / DE
Former [2001/49]Niestroy, Manfred , et al
Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner (G.b.R.), Sellierstrasse 1
07745 Jena / DE
Application number, filing date01110521.028.04.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateDE200012783529.05.2000         Original published format: DE 10027835
[2001/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1160065
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1160065
Date:07.05.2003
[2003/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1160065
Date:14.06.2006
Language:DE
[2006/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:B28B21/24
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/49]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Muffenrohres aus einem verdichtungsfähigen Gemenge[2001/49]
English:Method and apparatus for producing a socket pipe of a compactable material[2001/49]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de tuyau à manchon à partir d'un matériau compactable[2001/49]
Examination procedure24.09.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.09.2003Examination requested  [2003/47]
22.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2006Fee for grant paid
20.04.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
FR14.06.2006
GB14.06.2006
IE14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
TR14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]CY14.06.2006
FI14.06.2006
FR14.06.2006
GB14.06.2006
IE14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2008/52]FI14.06.2006
FR14.06.2006
GB14.06.2006
IE14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2008/22]FI14.06.2006
GB14.06.2006
IE14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
FR09.03.2007
Former [2008/19]FI14.06.2006
GB14.06.2006
IE14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
GR15.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2008/04]FI14.06.2006
GB14.06.2006
IE14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/36]FI14.06.2006
GB14.06.2006
IE14.06.2006
IT14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/27]FI14.06.2006
GB14.06.2006
IE14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/25]FI14.06.2006
IE14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/22]FI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
DK14.09.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/19]FI14.06.2006
NL14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2007/12]FI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
ES25.09.2006
PT14.11.2006
Former [2006/51]FI14.06.2006
SE14.09.2006
Former [2006/48]SE14.09.2006
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE1118680  (KANDERKIES A G) [X] 1 * column 3, line 15 - line 32 * [A] 4;
 [DXA]EP0015469  (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]) [DX] 1 * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * [A] 4;
 [A]SU806427  ;
 [A]US1895740  (UKROPINA BOZIDAR J) [A] 1,4 * page 4, column 2, line 109 - line 128 *;
 [A]SU1754460  ;
 [A]SU804455
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 47, Database accession no. 1981-M1304D, XP002234898 & SU806427 A 19810225 (MOSC ENG-CONS INST) [A] 1,4,9,14,15 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 35, Database accession no. 1993-279092, XP002234899 & SU1754460 A 19920815 (KHARK CIVIL ENG INST) [A] 1,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1981, no. 46, Database accession no. 1981-L8868D, XP002234900 & SU804455 A 19810215 (MOSC ENG-CONS INST) [A] 1,4 * abstract *