Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1160914

EP1160914 - Radome for a distance warning radar [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.2005
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2001/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Zimmermann, Werner
Tannenstrasse 14
85640 Putzbrunn / DE
 [2001/49]
Application number, filing date01110540.028.04.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateDE200012645427.05.2000         Original published format: DE 10026454
[2001/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1160914
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1160914
Date:04.09.2002
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1160914
Date:04.08.2004
Language:DE
[2004/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/42, H01Q1/02, H01Q1/32
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/49]
TitleGerman:Radom für ein Abstands-Warn-Radar (AWR)[2001/49]
English:Radome for a distance warning radar[2001/49]
French:Radome pour un dispositif radar de mesure de distance et d'alarme[2001/49]
Examination procedure30.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/14]
08.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2004Fee for grant paid
03.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI04.08.2004
IE04.08.2004
NL04.08.2004
TR04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
PT04.01.2005
AT28.04.2005
CY28.04.2005
LU28.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/27]FI04.08.2004
IE04.08.2004
NL04.08.2004
TR04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
AT28.04.2005
CY28.04.2005
LU28.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
Former [2007/26]FI04.08.2004
IE04.08.2004
NL04.08.2004
TR04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
AT28.04.2005
CY28.04.2005
LU28.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2007/20]FI04.08.2004
IE04.08.2004
NL04.08.2004
TR04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
AT28.04.2005
CY28.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2007/09]FI04.08.2004
IE04.08.2004
NL04.08.2004
TR04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
AT28.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2006/51]FI04.08.2004
IE04.08.2004
NL04.08.2004
TR04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
AT28.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2006/43]FI04.08.2004
IE04.08.2004
NL04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
AT28.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2006/25]FI04.08.2004
IE04.08.2004
NL04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2006/23]FI04.08.2004
IE04.08.2004
NL04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2006/14]FI04.08.2004
IE04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2005/24]FI04.08.2004
IE04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
Former [2005/22]FI04.08.2004
DK04.11.2004
GR04.11.2004
Former [2005/18]FI04.08.2004
GR04.11.2004
Former [2005/11]FI04.08.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0969550  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 44 * * column 4, line 42 - line 57 * * column 6, line 44 - line 58 *;
 [X]FR2755241  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 1 - page 4 *;
 [Y]US3805017  (ROBERTS D, et al) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5528249  (GAFFORD GEORGE [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *