Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254656

EP1254656 - Use of cationic compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.10.2004  [2004/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cognis Iberia, S.L.
Poligono San Vincente 08755 Castellbisbal
(Barcelona) / ES
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Cognis Iberia, S.L.
Poligono San Vincente
08755 Castellbisbal, (Barcelona) / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Prat Queralt, Esther
Calle Guillerias 18
08328 Alella / ES
02 / Amela Conesa, Christina
Giralt 3 B 2
08029 Cerdanyola del Vallés / ES
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Fabry, Bernd , et al
Cognis GmbH
Postfach 13 01 64
40551 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Fabry, Bernd, Dr. , et al
c/o Cognis Deutschland GmbH, CRT-IP, Postfach 13 01 64
40551 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date01110630.930.04.2001
[2002/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254656
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/50
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von kationischen Zubereitungen[2002/45]
English:Use of cationic compositions[2002/45]
French:Utilisation de compositions cationiques[2002/45]
Examination procedure30.04.2001Examination requested  [2002/45]
26.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/42]
11.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]DE19962874  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [E] 1,6,10-12,16-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0786250  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-10,16-20 * claim - *;
 [X]EP0885607  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-10,16-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19754283  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,16-20 * claim - *;
 [X]DE19743687  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,16-20 * claim - *;
 [X]EP0875500  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,11,16-20 * page 6, line 9; claim - *