Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1255352

EP1255352 - Power controller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2011
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2011  [2011/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Media Tek Inc.
1F, No. 13, Innovation Road 1, Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin Chu City
Taiwan 300 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Media Tek Inc.
1F, No. 13, Innovation Road 1, Science-Based Industrial Park
Hsin Chu City, Taiwan 300 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Chieh-Sheng
No. 86, Ming Ji Lee, Chung Chou, Hsueh Chia Chen
Tainan County, Taiwan / CN
02 / Su, Keng-Li
6F, No. 60, Lane 476, Section 1, Kwang Fu Road
Hsinchu, Taiwan / CN
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Urner, Peter
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Urner, Peter, Dipl.-Phys.
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date01110781.003.05.2001
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255352
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:H03G3/30
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
TitleGerman:Leistungsverstärker[2002/45]
English:Power controller[2002/45]
French:Commande de puissance[2002/45]
Examination procedure21.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/17]
25.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
29.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/31]
16.03.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/31]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.07.2005
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
18.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
23.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
26.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]US6148220  (SHARP STEVEN J [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 17 - line 22; figure 6 *;
 [YA]US5903854  (ABE MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * figure 10 * [A] 2;
 [A]EP0977354  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 3 * abstract *