blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1255339

EP1255339 - Boltless wedge clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2007
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.09.2007  [2007/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Richard Bergner Elektroarmaturen GmbH & Co.KG
Bahnhofstrasse 8-16
91126 Schwabach / DE
[2006/41]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Richard Bergner Elektroarmaturen GmbH & Co.KG
Bahnhofstrasse 8-16
91126 Schwabach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bily, Libor
Kirchenegger 2
6713 Ludesch / AT
02 / Brettschneider, Ulf, Dipl.-Ing.
Heidenschanze 36
01189 Dresden / DE
03 / Faber, Dietmar, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Südring 45
91785 Pleinfeld / DE
04 / Grossmann, Steffen, Dr.-Ing.
Leibnitzstrasse 10
01187 Dresden / DE
05 / Linaschke, Rolf
Augustusweg 17a
01445 Radebeul / DE
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Heyner, Klaus
Mittelweg 1h
01728 Bannewitz/Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Heyner, Klaus, Dr.-Ing.
Mittelweg 1h
01728 Bannewitz/Dresden / DE
Application number, filing date01110907.105.05.2001
[2002/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1255339
Date:06.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1255339
Date:11.10.2006
Language:DE
[2006/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.10.2001
ClassificationIPC:H02G7/05
[2002/45]
CPC:
H02G7/056 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT [2003/30]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schraubenlose Keilspannklemme[2002/45]
English:Boltless wedge clamp[2002/45]
French:Pince d'ancrage à cale sans vis[2002/45]
Examination procedure29.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/14]
07.05.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.09.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
22.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2006Fee for grant paid
22.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
27.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
16.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
18.06.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0132208  (MALICO SA [FR]) [A] 1,8,9 * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]FR2647878  (CAPELLES DE LA FUENTE ROSA [ES]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE4019999  (PREFORMED LINE PRODUCTS GREAT [GB]) [DA] 1,12* the whole document *;
 [A]EP0486375  (DERANCOURT ETS [FR]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.