Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161863

EP1161863 - Container for spreading useful organisms [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 28.02.2007  [2007/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
For all designated states
AMW Nützlinge GmbH
Ausserhalb 54
64319 Pfungstadt / DE
[2003/50]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
For all designated states
AMW Nützlinge GmbH
Ausserhalb 54
64319 Pfungstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Herbstreit, Rolf
Hohlgasse 21
72178 Waldachtal / DE
02 / Wührer, Bernd, Dr.
Hillebergstrasse 18
64319 Pfungstadt / DE
 [2001/50]
Application number, filing date01111092.109.05.2001
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateDE200012776707.06.2000         Original published format: DE 10027767
[2001/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1161863
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1161863
Date:10.12.2003
Language:DE
[2003/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:A01K67/033
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/50]
TitleGerman:Behältnis zum Ausbringen von Nützlingen[2001/50]
English:Container for spreading useful organisms[2001/50]
French:Conteneur pour épandre des organismes utiles[2001/50]
Examination procedure23.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/26]
06.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2003Fee for grant paid
18.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY10.12.2003
FI10.12.2003
IE10.12.2003
TR10.12.2003
GR10.03.2004
SE10.03.2004
LU09.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
[2007/09]
Former [2006/51]FI10.12.2003
IE10.12.2003
TR10.12.2003
GR10.03.2004
SE10.03.2004
LU09.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
Former [2005/23]FI10.12.2003
IE10.12.2003
GR10.03.2004
SE10.03.2004
LU09.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
Former [2005/11]FI10.12.2003
IE10.12.2003
GR10.03.2004
SE10.03.2004
MC31.05.2004
Former [2004/40]FI10.12.2003
IE10.12.2003
GR10.03.2004
SE10.03.2004
Former [2004/33]FI10.12.2003
GR10.03.2004
SE10.03.2004
Former [2004/26]FI10.12.2003
SE10.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE10.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US4785764  (MUELLER HANS-RUDOLF [CH]) [X] 1-6 * column W *