Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1158195

EP1158195 - Disc brake actuator with caliper and heat protection of the boot [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.10.2004
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meritor HVS Cameri S.p.A.
Strada Provinciale Cameri/Bellinzago km 5
28060 Cameri (NO) / IT
[2001/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Conti, Roberto
Via Unita d'Italia 4
21057 Olgiate Olona (VA) / IT
02 / Bellomi, Giovanni
Via Visintin 13
28100 Novara / IT
 [2001/48]
Representative(s)Degwert, Hartmut
Prinz & Partner
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Degwert, Hartmut
Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2001/48]Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys.
Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date01111212.514.05.2001
[2001/48]
Priority number, dateIT2000MI0115024.05.2000         Original published format: IT MI001150
[2001/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1158195
Date:28.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1158195
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16D55/22, F16D65/00, F16D65/20
[2002/39]
Former International [2001/48]F16D55/22, F16D65/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/24]
Former [2001/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Scheibenbremse mit Schwimmsattel und Wärmeschutz für die elastische Manschette[2004/11]
English:Disc brake actuator with caliper and heat protection of the boot[2001/48]
French:Frein à disque à étrier avec une protection thermique du soufflet[2001/48]
Former [2001/48]Scheibenbremse mit Schwimsattel und Wärmeschutz für die elastische Manschette
Examination procedure21.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/21]
26.03.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
10.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/51]
16.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
30.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5487453  (MORONI JONNY [FR]) [X] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [X]US4527672  (SCHREINER PETER [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 4 - column 3, line 14; figure - *;
 [A]US4537289  (VONGRUENBERG HUBERTUS [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 7, lines 42-54; figure - *;
 [A]US4248329  (TORIGOE MASAHIKO) [A] 1,4 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2165902  (DAYTON WALTHER CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *