Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162051

EP1162051 - Methods and apparatus for producing foamed thermoplastics articles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - applicantpublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
[2009/51]
Former [2007/03]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27c
80686 München / DE
Former [2006/31]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Hansastrasse 27 c
80686 München / DE
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Elsner, Peter
Amselstrasse 8
76327 Pfinztal / DE
02 / Krause, Wenzel
Am Sixenrain 5
76199 Karlsruhe / DE
03 / Troster, Stefan
Nebeniusstrasse 35
76137 Karlsruhe / DE
04 / Henning, Frank
Eschenweg 5
76327 Pfinztal / DE
05 / Radtke, Andreas
Pfinztalstrasse 96
76227 Karlsruhe / DE
06 / Walch, Michael
Untere Dorfstrasse 21
76327 Pfinztal / DE
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2006/18]
Former [2001/50]Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date01111386.710.05.2001
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateDE200012823707.06.2000         Original published format: DE 10028237
[2001/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1162051
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1162051
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1162051
Date:02.08.2006
Language:DE
[2006/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:B29C44/34, B29C44/58
[2002/47]
Former International [2001/50]B29C44/34
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2003/33]
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von geschäumten thermoplastischen Formteilen[2006/07]
English:Methods and apparatus for producing foamed thermoplastics articles[2001/50]
French:Procédés et dispositif pour la production d'articles thermoplastiques expansés[2006/07]
Former [2001/50]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von geschäumten thermoplastischen Formteilung
Former [2001/50]Procédé et dispositif pour la production d'articles thermoplastiques expansés
Examination procedure04.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
27.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2006Fee for grant paid
08.06.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
26.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB02.08.2006
[2008/04]
Former [2007/36]GB02.08.2006
IT02.08.2006
Former [2007/28]GB02.08.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0376064  (TOYO ENGINEERING CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0610953  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 13, line 1 - line 14 *;
 [A]US3619438  (CISTONE DAVID R) [A] 5-8,13,18-20,30 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2000025057  ;
 [A]EP0809257  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, [A] 1-30 * abstract *