Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257065

EP1257065 - Frequency synthesiser for mobile terminals for wireless telecommunication systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony International (Europe) GmbH
Kemperplatz 1
10785 Berlin / DE
[2002/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Camuffo, Andrea, c/o Sony Int. (Europe) GmbH
Digital Telecom. Europe, Heisenbergbogen 1
85609 Aschheim / DE
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Körber, Martin, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date01111428.710.05.2001
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257065
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/40
[2002/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2003/31]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Frequenzsynthetisierer für mobile Endgeräte für ein drahtloses Telekommunikationssystem[2002/46]
English:Frequency synthesiser for mobile terminals for wireless telecommunication systems[2002/46]
French:Synthétiseur de fréquence pour des terminaux mobiles pour un système de télécommunication sans fil[2002/46]
Examination procedure14.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/12]
14.05.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.08.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR
11.02.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
17.06.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0117124  (CONEXANT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 12; figure 5 *;
 [E]EP1113584  (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [E] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 25 - line 26; figure 1 * * column 2, line 48 *;
 [X]WO0019627  (CONEXANT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * page 12, line 23 - page 13, line 21; figure 6 *;
 [A]EP1001548  (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *