Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1155736

EP1155736 - Solution and process for producing biochip [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2011Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.04.2011  [2011/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HITACHI SOFTWARE ENGINEERING CO., LTD.
6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/47]For all designated states
Hitachi Software Engineering Co., Ltd.
6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Toshiaki, Hitachi Software Engineering Co.
Intel. Prop. Center, 6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP
02 / Yamamoto, Kenji, Hitachi Software Engineering Co.
Intel. Prop. Center, 6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP
03 / Yoshi, Junji, Hitachi Software Engineering Co.
Intel. Prop. Center, 6-81, Onoe-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 231-8475 / JP
04 / Tsujimoto, Atsumi, c/o DNA Chip Research Inc.
134, Godo-cho, Hodogaya-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0005 / JP
05 / Nasu, Hisanori
313-3, Kamiida-cho, Izumi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 245-0018 / JP
 [2001/47]
Representative(s)Liesegang, Roland
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/47]Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date01111437.810.05.2001
[2001/47]
Priority number, dateJP2000014509917.05.2000         Original published format: JP 2000145099
[2001/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1155736
Date:21.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1155736
Date:25.06.2003
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/00
[2001/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/12]
Former [2001/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Lösung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von einem Biochip[2001/47]
English:Solution and process for producing biochip[2001/47]
French:Solution et procédé pour la production d'une biopuce[2001/47]
Examination procedure10.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/47]
15.09.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2011Application withdrawn by applicant  [2011/17]
17.05.2011Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9845205  (PACKARD INSTRUMENT CO INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, line 2 - page 2, line 2 * * page 6, line 15 - line 28 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 12 * * page 23, line 20 - line 23; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4877745  (HAYES DONALD J [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 12 * * column 2, line 4 - line 9 * * column 18, line 41 - line 51 *;
 [X]US5508200  (TIFFANY THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 17; figures 4,5 *;
 [X]EP0947819  (HITACHI SOFTWARE ENG [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 8, line 43 - column 9, line 4 *;
 [PX]WO0045955  (WIKTOR PETER [US]) [PX] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 14 * * page 7, line 5 - line 19 * * page 8, line 8 - line 20; figures 1,2 *