Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1155645

EP1155645 - Decoration system for windows, doors or similar [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.04.2009
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.05.2009  [2009/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
August Bünger Bob-Textilwerk GmbH & Co. KG
Wichlinghauser Strasse 38-40
42277 Wuppertal / DE
[2001/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Bünger, Hans-Joachim, Dr.
Freiligrathstrasse 68a
42289 Wuppertal / DE
 [2001/47]
Representative(s)Mentzel, Norbert
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse
Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel
Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig
Kleiner Werth 34
42275 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/47]Mentzel, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse, Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel, Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Kleiner Werth 34
42275 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date01111482.411.05.2001
[2001/47]
Priority number, dateDE200012408918.05.2000         Original published format: DE 10024089
DE2001203970U07.03.2001         Original published format: DE 20103970 U
[2001/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1155645
Date:21.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1155645
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A47H5/14
[2001/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/09]
Former [2001/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dekorationssystem für Fenster, Türen od. dgl.[2001/47]
English:Decoration system for windows, doors or similar[2001/47]
French:Systême pour la décoration de fenêtres, portes ou similaire[2001/47]
Examination procedure18.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/51]
22.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/22]
14.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2009/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
01.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
21.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200505   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2005
31.05.200606   M06   Fee paid on   01.08.2006
31.05.200808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5112157  (HAARER STEVEN R [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,12,13,16,18,19 * column W *;
 [A]US1591209  (BOYE JAMES H) [A] 1,2,5,6,16-18 * column W *;
 [AD]DE8200021U  (BAKER DRAPERY CORP.) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2290020  (SEDDON IVOR HENRY [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE8200021U
 DE2228234