Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258229

EP1258229 - Flexible and elastic vascular stents and grafts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.02.2004  [2004/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VASCULAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
1240 Eagle Road
New Hope, PA 18938 / US
[2002/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Wakhloo, Ajay K.
781 Crandon Boulevard, Apt. 505
Key Biscayne, FL 33149 / US
02 / Kalidindi, Surya R.
1767 Heritage Boulevard, Apt. 11202
Tallahassee, FL 32308 / US
03 / Gobran, Riad H.
1240 Eagle Raod
New Hope, PA 18938 / US
04 / Khan, Yusuf, S.
130 Arch Street, 407
Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US
05 / Naidu, Naveen
2049 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US
06 / Ko, Frank K.
5144 Castor Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19124 / US
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Harrison, Michael Charles , et al
Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]Harrison, Michael Charles , et al
Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date01111760.315.05.2001
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1258229
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06
[2002/47]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/32]
Former [2002/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Flexible und ausdehnbare vaskuläre Stents und Gewebe[2002/47]
English:Flexible and elastic vascular stents and grafts[2002/47]
French:Stents flexibles et élastiques et greffons vasculaires[2002/47]
Examination procedure21.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/09]
12.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/09]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
25.06.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.06.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5741332  (SCHMITT PETER J [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,11-13 * column 11, line 44 - line 63 * * column 9, line 8 - line 31 * * column 10, line 15 - line 17 * * figure - * [Y] 7,14;
 [Y]EP0804909  (SCHNEIDER USA INC [US]) [Y] 7,14 * column 16, line 39 - line 55 *
by applicantUS4739762
 US5108416
 US5147385
 US5192297
 US4969896
 US4954126
 US5163951
 US5211658