Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159992

EP1159992 - Training game device, control method thereof, and readable storage medium for storing training game programs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.08.2008
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd.
7-2, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8324 / JP
[2008/25]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Konami Corporation
3-1, Toranomon 4-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kondo, Tetsuya
c/o KCEO Inc., 5-25, Umeda, 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka.shi, Osaka / JP
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date01111779.315.05.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateJP2000014222615.05.2000         Original published format: JP 2000142226
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1159992
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1159992
Date:31.07.2002
[2002/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/10
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/17]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Trainingsspielvorrichtung, Steuerverfahren dafür, und lesbares Speichermedium zur Speicherung von Trainingsspielprogrammen[2001/49]
English:Training game device, control method thereof, and readable storage medium for storing training game programs[2001/49]
French:Dispositif de jeu d'entraînement, son procédé de commande, et support d'enregistrement lisible pour enregistrer des programmes de jeu d'entraînement[2001/49]
Examination procedure05.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/45]
01.02.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
15.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2008Application withdrawn by applicant  [2008/37]
15.07.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2008
15.07.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.10.2008Date of oral proceedings
23.10.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
01.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0962891  (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,8,10 * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 8 * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0078] *;
 [A]US5885156  (TOYOHARA KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,8,10 * column 6, line 48 - line 65 *
 [A]  TRULSEN O ET AL, "Championship Manager Season 97/98", [ONLINE], (199711), pages 1 - 10, XP002116024 [A] 1,3,8,10 * page 2, paragraph 5 * * page 5, paragraph 1 *