EP1258795 - Apparatus for secure generation of signatures for personal computers and mobile phones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markwitz, Wernhard, Dr. Reichenbachstrasse 25 80469 München / DE | [2002/47] | Application number, filing date | 01111791.8 | 15.05.2001 | [2002/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1258795 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, G07C9/00 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06F21/34 (EP);
G07C9/257 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2003/32] |
Former [2002/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung zur sicheren Erzeugung von Signaturen für Personal-computer und Mobiltelefone. | [2002/47] | English: | Apparatus for secure generation of signatures for personal computers and mobile phones | [2002/47] | French: | Appareil permettant de générer des signatures électroniques sûres pour des ordinateurs pesonnels et des téléphones mobiles | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/11] | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.06.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.06.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.06.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE4243908 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 37 *; | [A]US5479509 (UGON MICHEL [FR]) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2746201 (SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY [US]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0848315 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * column 2, line 6 - column 2, line 48 *; | [A]DE19703970 (WILKE THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [X]US6003135 (BIALICK WILLIAM P [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 6, line 46 - column 13, line 61 * * column 17, line 20 - column 18, line 47 * * column 21, line 34 - column 21, line 44 *; | [Y]GB2342749 (TOPPING CATHERINE [GB]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * column W *; | [X]EP1001329 (ALADDIN KNOWLEDGE SYSTEMS LTD [IL]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0021] - [0032] , [0035] - [0041] - [0043] - [0046] - [0049] , [0054] , [0056] , [0058] , [0062] , [0063] , [0068] - [0071] - [0085] , [0088] *; | [X]DE19860177 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 3, line 18 - page 3, line 21 * * page 3, line 27 - page 3, line 38 * * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 4 * * page 4, line 17 - page 4, line 21 * * page 4, line 61 - page 5, line 7 * * page 5, line 14 - page 5, line 17 *; | [X]WO0042491 (RAINBOW TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - page 5, line 20 * * page 5, line 27 - page 7, line 29 * * page 13, line 24 - page 15, line 8 * * page 32, line 28 - page 32, line 30 *; | [X]EP1035461 (BDC EDV CONSULTING GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0012] - [0015] - [0018] - [0022] , [0023] , [0025] , [0027] - [0029] *; | [A]DE19940341 (VOGEL KOLJA [DE], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [XP]DE19952944 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [XP] 1-3 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [A] - WIBU-KEY, User's Guide Version 2.50 (URL), (199807), XP002139279 [A] 1 * page 15 * * page 164 * | [A] - BUCHHEIT M, SOFTWARE-KOPIERSCHUTZ, ELEKTRONIK, FRANZIS VERLAG GMBH. MUNCHEN, DE, VOL. 41, NR. 14, PAGE(S) 68-74, ISSN 0013-5658, XP000307635 [A] 1 * page 73 - page 74 * |