Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1167716

EP1167716 - Air intake duct system for a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pierburg GmbH
Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1
41460 Neuss / DE
[2002/31]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
Pierburg Aktiengesellschaft
Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1
41460 Neuss / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kühnel, Hans-Ulrich
Kranichstrasse 5
41239 Mönchengladbach / DE
02 / Hüsges, Hans-Jürgen
Hörenweg 18
47877 Willich / DE
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)ter Smitten, Hans
Pierburg GmbH
Patentabteilung
Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1
41460 Neuss / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/15]Ter Smitten, Hans
Pierburg GmbH, Patentabteilung, Alfred-Pierburg Strasse 1
41460 Neuss / DE
Former [2002/01]Ter Smitten, Hans
Rheinmetall AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Rheinmetall Allee 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date01111798.316.05.2001
[2002/01]
Priority number, dateDE200013207201.07.2000         Original published format: DE 10032072
[2002/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1167716
Date:02.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1167716
Date:18.12.2002
[2002/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1167716
Date:11.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:F02B27/02
[2002/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/37]
Former [2002/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Luftansaugkanalsystem für eine Brennkraftmaschine[2002/01]
English:Air intake duct system for a combustion engine[2002/01]
French:Système de conduits d'air d'admission pour moteur à combustion[2002/01]
Examination procedure16.05.2001Examination requested  [2002/01]
25.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2004Fee for grant paid
04.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US6073601  (GUICHARD ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 48 - column 7, line 47 *;
 [A]EP0980968  (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 50 - column 8, line 44; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]DE19849119  (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 52; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19845140  (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 44; figure 1 *;
 [DA]DE19756332  (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 39; figures 1,5 *;
 [A]GB2239899  (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 8 - page 12, line 20; figure 2 *
by applicantDE19756332