Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1158109

EP1158109 - Fire resistant board material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2004
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.03.2004  [2004/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lancaster Fibre Technology Group Ltd.
Lune Industrial Estate, 33 Europa Way
Lancaster LA1 5QP / GB
[2001/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Bowman, John Oliver
2 Abbeyfield Close
Scotforth, Lancaster, Lancs LA1 2 NL / GB
02 / Taylor, Rodney
117 Cheltenham Road
Evesham, Worcester WR11 6lf / GB
 [2001/48]
Representative(s)Walsh, David Patrick , et al
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/48]Walsh, David Patrick , et al
Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date01111800.716.05.2001
[2001/48]
Priority number, dateGB2000001284526.05.2000         Original published format: GB 0012845
[2001/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1158109
Date:28.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1158109
Date:20.11.2002
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:E04B1/80, E04B1/94
[2001/48]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/32]
Former [2001/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Feuerhemmendes Plattenmaterial[2001/48]
English:Fire resistant board material[2001/48]
French:Matériau pour plaque résistant au feu[2001/48]
Examination procedure21.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/11]
26.09.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/11]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
04.07.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
04.07.2003M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9954536  (ASSET ASSOC LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7,10-14 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 5 * * page 8, paragraph 4 * * page 13, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]EP0356320  (DAUSSAN & CO [FR]) [A] 1,2,7,10,11 * column 4, lines 39-50; claims 1,11 *;
 [A]EP0027276  (LUCHTRATH BERN) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 4 *