EP1174337 - Air conditioning device suspension for wide-body aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2005/39] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states EADS Airbus GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelnhofer, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Wellenstrasse 8A 21635 Jork / DE | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112181.1 | 18.05.2001 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | DE2000135301 | 18.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10035301 | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1174337 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1174337 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1174337 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/00, B64D13/00 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
B64D13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/04] | Title | German: | Klimaanlagenaufhängung für ein Grossraum-Verkehrsflugzeug | [2002/04] | English: | Air conditioning device suspension for wide-body aircraft | [2002/04] | French: | Suspension d'un dispositif de conditionnement d'air pour avion gros porteur | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Request for further processing for: | 19.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.09.2005 | FI | 28.09.2005 | IE | 28.09.2005 | IT | 28.09.2005 | NL | 28.09.2005 | TR | 28.09.2005 | DK | 28.12.2005 | GR | 28.12.2005 | SE | 28.12.2005 | ES | 08.01.2006 | PT | 28.02.2006 | AT | 18.05.2006 | LU | 18.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | CH | 31.05.2006 | LI | 31.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
TR | 28.09.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
AT | 18.05.2006 | ||
LU | 18.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/46] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
AT | 18.05.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
IT | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
IE | 28.09.2005 | ||
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
DK | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
ES | 08.01.2006 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
PT | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
NL | 28.09.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 28.09.2005 | |
SE | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11211215 ; | [A]GB1585798 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-7 * column 1, lines 10-47 ** figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11211215 A 19990806 (DANREI KOGYO KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figure 1 * |