Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260528

EP1260528 - Propylene polymer pipes for pipelines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.02.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.04.2003  [2003/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis Technology Oy
P.O. Box 330
06201 Porvoo / FI
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Borealis Technology OY
P.O. Box 330
06201 Porvoo / FI
Representative(s)VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co
Wolfgang-Pauli-Strasse 2
4020 Linz / AT
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co
Stahlstrasse 21 a
4020 Linz / AT
Application number, filing date01112366.821.05.2001
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1260528
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08F110/06, C08F297/08, C08K5/00, F16L9/12
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Polypropylenrohre für Pipelines[2002/48]
English:Propylene polymer pipes for pipelines[2002/48]
French:Tuyaux de polypropylène pour des pipelines[2002/48]
Examination procedure24.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/16]
04.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5)  [2003/16]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9924479  (BOREALIS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * example -; claim -; table - * [Y] 1-10;
 [X]WO9713790  (BOREALIS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,9,10 * page 11, line 16 - line 20; examples 6,8; claim - *;
 [X]EP0714923  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * page 7, line 48 - page 8, line 5; example -; claim -; table - *;
 [X]WO9940151  (PCD POLYMERE GES MBH [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE29722949U  (DANUBIA PETROCHEM POLYMERE [AT]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * page 6, line 30; example -; claim - *;
 [DY]EP0177961  (DANUBIA PETROCHEMIE [AT]) [DY] 1-10 * example -; claim -; table 3 *;
 [DY]EP0790262  (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [DY] 1-10 * page 8, line 50 - page 18, line 56; claim - *;
 [E]WO0140327  (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,2,9,10 * example -; claim - *