EP1161015 - Optical transmission system, its method, and optical amplification transmission line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KDDI Corporation 3-2, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-8003 / JP | For all designated states KDD Submarine Cable Systems Inc. 7-1, Nishishinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states KDDI Corporation 3-2, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-8003 / JP | ||
For all designated states KDD Submarine Cable Systems Inc. 7-1, Nishishinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states KDDI Corporation 3-2, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-8003 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuritani, Takehiro c/o KDDI R&D Laboratories Inc. 2-1-15 Ohara, Kamifukuoka-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Yuichi c/o KDDI R&D Laboratories Inc. 2-1-15 Ohara, Kamifukuoka-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Edagawa, Noboru c/o KDDI R&D Laboratories Inc. 2-1-15 Ohara, Kamifukuoka-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Masatoshi c/o KDDI R&D Laboratories Inc. 2-1-15 Ohara, Kamifukuoka-shi, Saitama / JP | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/49] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112403.9 | 21.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | JP20000162623 | 31.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000162623 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1161015 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1161015 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04B10/17 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
H04B10/2935 (EP,US);
H04J14/0221 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/49] | H04J14/02, H04B10/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/07] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Übertragungssystem, sein Verfahren, und optische Übertragungsstrecke mit optischer Verstärkung | [2001/49] | English: | Optical transmission system, its method, and optical amplification transmission line | [2001/49] | French: | Système de transmission optique, son procédé, et ligne de transmission optique avec amplification optique | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 22.11.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.03.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 21.02.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0999663 (KDD CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-11,13,15,16 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 1, paragraph 5 - paragraph 8 * * column 4, paragraph 16 - column 7, paragraph 25; figures 1-4 * * column 9, paragraph 33 - column 10, paragraph 38; figures 10-12 * [Y] 5,7,12,14; | [PX]WO0054447 (PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI SPA [IT], et al) [PX] 1-16 * page 5, line 21 - page 11, line 7 * * page 11, line 27 - page 13, line 3; figure 1 * * page 14, line 24 - line 26 * * page 15, line 7 - line 21; figure 3 * * page 18, line 8 - page 19, line 25 *; | [XA] - ZOU X Y ET AL, "COMPENSATION OF RAMAN SCATTERING AND EDFA'S NONUNIFORM GAIN IN ULTRA-LONG-DISTANCE WDM LINKS", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (1996), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 139 - 141, XP000547559 [X] 1,6-8,13,14 * page 139, column L, paragraph 1 - column R, paragraph 3 * * page 140, column R, paragraph 2 - page 141, column R, paragraph 2; figures 1A,1B,2A,2B,2C,3A,3B,3C * [A] 2-5,9-12,15,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.475805 | [Y] - SCHEERER C ET AL, "SRS CROSSTALK IN PREEMPHASIZED WDM SYSTEMS", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE. (OFC). TECHNICAL DIGEST POSTCONFERENCE EDITION. BALTIMORE, MD, MARCH 7 - 10, 2000, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20000307), vol. 2 OF 4, ISBN 0-7803-5952-6, pages WM28-1/293 - WM28-3/295, XP001035933 [Y] 5,7,12,14 * page 293, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 293, paragraph 6 - page 294, paragraph 5; figures 1-6 * |