Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1164114

EP1164114 - Shaped body of polymer-derived ceramic [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2005Refusal of applicationpublished on 08.02.2006  [2006/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SGL Carbon AG
Rheingaustrasse 182
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
SGL CARBON AG
Rheingaustrasse 182
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Greil, Peter, Prof. Dr.
Am Hochstock 27
91085 Weisendorf / DE
02 / Dernovsek, Oliver, Dipl.-Ing.
Franziskaner-Strasse 11
81669 München / DE
03 / Güther, Hans-Michael, Dipl.-Ing.
Limburger Strasse 12b
61462 Königstein / DE
04 / Wislsperger, Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing.
Erftstrasse 12
53175 Bonn / DE
 [2001/51]
Application number, filing date01112517.623.05.2001
[2001/51]
Priority number, dateDE200013001117.06.2000         Original published format: DE 10030011
[2001/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1164114
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1164114
Date:03.07.2002
[2002/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/571, C04B35/589, C04B35/528, C04B35/14, C04B35/634, F16C33/04, C04B35/52
[2002/27]
Former International [2001/51]C04B35/571, C04B35/589, C04B35/528, C04B35/14, C04B35/634, F16C33/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/51]
TitleGerman:Formteil aus von Polymeren abgeleiteter Keramik[2001/51]
English:Shaped body of polymer-derived ceramic[2001/51]
French:Corps moulé en ceramique à partir des polymères[2001/51]
Examination procedure12.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
22.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/06]
08.09.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XDAY]DE19806044  (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [XD] 1,2 * page 3, line 13 - line 36; examples 1-3; claims 1-8 * [A] 28 [Y] 5-21,26,27;
 [Y]EP0400862  (ETHYL CORP [US]) [Y] 5-21,26,27 * column 1, line 32 - line 51; examples 2-4; claims 1,7 *