EP1161899 - Pull out device for a vertical drawer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fulterer Gesellschaft m.b.H. Höchster Strasse 6890 Lustenau / AT | [2001/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corona, Stefan Kehlerstrasse 72 D 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Hefel, Herbert, et al Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6800 Feldkirch / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Hefel, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Egelseestrasse 65a Postfach 61 6800 Feldkirch / AT | Application number, filing date | 01112645.5 | 25.05.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | AT20000000986 | 06.06.2000 Original published format: AT 9862000 | [2001/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161899 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1161899 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/06 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
A47B88/42 (EP,US);
A47B2088/421 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2002/36] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ausziehvorrichtung für einen Hochschrankauszug | [2001/50] | English: | Pull out device for a vertical drawer | [2001/50] | French: | Dispositif à coulisse pour un tiroir vertical | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 13.06.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 23.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.07.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.07.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2372608 (HERGER SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE3925815 (FULTERER GMBH [AT]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE19526108 (GANSERA MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - line 56 *; | [A]AT406006B (FULTERER GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE9316213U | AT406006B |