Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159899

EP1159899 - Display unit, especially for carpets, posters, fabrics [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2003  [2003/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gomes, Joachim
Wagnerstrasse 86
73072 Donzdorf / DE
For all designated states
Krämer, Helmut
Scheerstrasse 48
73054 Eislingen / DE
[2001/49]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Vetter, Hans
Patentanwälte, Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel, Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Vetter, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.
Patentanwalte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109
73730 Esslingen / DE
Application number, filing date01112652.125.05.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateDE200012682730.05.2000         Original published format: DE 10026827
[2001/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1159899
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:A47F7/16
[2001/49]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/35]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Präsentationseinrichtung, insbesondere für Teppiche, Bilder, Stoffe[2001/49]
English:Display unit, especially for carpets, posters, fabrics[2001/49]
French:Présentoir, en particulier pour tapis, affiches, tissus[2001/49]
Examination procedure06.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/18]
13.11.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/18]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.08.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
19.08.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.08.2002M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US1431637  (DE LISLE THOMAS C) [X] 1,2,4,5,10-13 * page 2, line 85 - line 129; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]US2577366  (ERNEST REISS, et al) [Y] 1-13 * column 1, line 1 - line 33 * * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 31; figures 2-4,6 *;
 [Y]GB540833  (WALTER HATTON TURNER) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, line 73 - line 78 * * page 3, line 25 - line 38; figures 1-3,5 *;
 [A]DE3000481  (NOWO NOTTROTT & WOLF [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 12, paragraph 1; figure 1 *