Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1160447

EP1160447 - Piston compressor discharge port [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.05.2003  [2003/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki
2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho
2-1, Toyoda-cho, Kariya-shi
Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kimura, Naofumi
KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8671 / JP
02 / Obayashi, Masakazu
KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8671 / JP
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date01112660.425.05.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateJP2000016436801.06.2000         Original published format: JP 2000164368
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1160447
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
ClassificationInternational:F04B27/10, F04B39/10
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Druckauslass für einen Kolbenverdichter[2001/49]
English:Piston compressor discharge port[2001/49]
French:Orifice de refoulement d'un compresseur à pistons[2001/49]
Examination procedure25.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
06.03.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/18]
Cited inby applicant JPH11241683