Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162218

EP1162218 - Aqueous dispersions of urethane-acrylic copolymers and their use as finishing agents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.04.2009
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.05.2009  [2009/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LAMBERTI S.p.A.
Via Piave 18
21041 Albizzate (Varese) / IT
[2001/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Alanzo, Vito
c/o LAMBERTI SpA, via Piave 18
21041 Albizzate / IT
02 / Locatelli, Monica
c/o LAMBERTI SpA, via Piave 18
21041 Albizzate / IT
03 / Giordano, Sergio
c/o LAMBERTI SpA, via Piave 18
21041 Albizzate / IT
04 / Li Bassi, Giuseppe
c/o LAMBERTI SpA, via Piave 18
21041 Albizzate / IT
 [2001/50]
Application number, filing date01112688.525.05.2001
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateIT2000VA0001708.06.2000         Original published format: IT VA000017
[2001/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1162218
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:C08F290/06, C08F220/22, C09D151/08
[2001/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/50]
TitleGerman:Wässrige Dispersionen von Urethan-Acrylcopolymeren und ihre Verwendung als Ausrüstungsmittel[2001/50]
English:Aqueous dispersions of urethane-acrylic copolymers and their use as finishing agents[2001/50]
French:Dispersions aqueuses de copolymères urethanne-acryliques et leur utilisation comme agents de finissage[2001/50]
Examination procedure21.05.2002Examination requested  [2002/33]
25.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/19]
15.12.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2009/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
11.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5164252  (HENNING WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5623016  (KLEIN HEINZ-PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, lines 41-45 *;
 [A]US4373043  (YAGI KAZUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 8, lines 3-22; claim 1 *;
 [PX]DE19953446  (BASF COATINGS AG [DE]) [PX] 1 * column 11, lines 50-57 * * column 14, lines 41-54 * * column 8, lines 15-47 *