Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1159904

EP1159904 - Automatic high energy saving cooker [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.12.2006
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.01.2007  [2007/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APPLY INNOVATION
Room "F", Ho Lee Commercial Building, 3rd Floor, 38-44 D'Aguilar Street
Central / HK
[2001/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Ng, Andrew
1/Floor, 84 Po Wah Yen
Yung Shue Wan, Lamma Island / HK
02 / Ng, Wing Tong
2B Headland
Shek O / HK
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date01112736.225.05.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateUS2000058046926.05.2000         Original published format: US 580469
[2001/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1159904
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1159904
Date:30.10.2002
[2002/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:A47J27/08
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/30]
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Automatischer Energiesparender Dampfdruckkocher[2001/49]
English:Automatic high energy saving cooker[2001/49]
French:Autocuiseur automatique économiseur d'énergie[2001/49]
Examination procedure07.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
03.05.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
04.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
11.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/01]
18.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.06.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200606   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4608260  (ANDRE WOLFRAM K [DE]) [X] 1-4,28-32 * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 61; figures 5,6 * [Y] 5-10,13-27;
 [Y]EP0919169  (GUANGDONG RONGSHENG ELECTRIC H [CN]) [Y] 5 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 32; figure 1 * * column 4, line 18 - line 23 *;
 [Y]GB2217629  (MERWOOD LTD [GB]) [Y] 5,6,8,19 * page 4, line 16 - line 30; figure 1 * * page 11, line 17 - line 21 * * page 16, line 3 - line 6 *;
 [YD]US5727448  (SA YONG-JAE [KR]) [YD] 7 * abstract *;
 [Y]DE2722675  (KARL PRINZ AG) [Y] 9,10 * page 4, paragraph 1 *;
 [Y]DE3510542  (SILIT WERKE [DE]) [Y] 13,14,19-27 * column 4, line 6 - column 4, line 43; figures 1,4 *;
 [Y]GB1436269  (CHEMETRON CORP) [Y] 15-18 * page 3, line 102 - line 105 *;
 [XY]DE559955  (ANDREA RICCARDO PAGANO) [X] 33-36,40 * page 1, line 21 - line 60; figures 1,2 * [Y] 37-39;
 [Y]DE920094  (KURT BELLINO & CO K G DR) [Y] 37 * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 80; figures 1,3 *;
 [Y]FR1218731  (ARROW) [Y] 38,39 * page 1, line 7 - line 15; figure 1 *
by applicantUS3908111
 US4591698
 US4315139
 US4421974
 US5717448
 US5031519
 US5567458
 US5643485
 US4587405
 US5839357