Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1160075

EP1160075 - Halogen-free composite film, process for its manufacture and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2007
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hueck Folien GmbH
Gewerbepark 30
4342 Baumgartenberg / AT
[2001/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Treutlein, Roland
Pirkmühle 13
92712 Pirk / DE
02 / Geitner, Werner
Schneiderweg 5
92699 Irchenrieth / DE
03 / Kesmarsky, Thomas, Dr.
Holunderweg 11
92712 Pirk / DE
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Hagemeier, Annette
Dr. Annette Hagemeier Patentanwältin Fachastrasse 7
85232 Bergkirchen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/27]Hagemeier, Annette
Dr. Annette Hagemeier Patentanwältin Fachastrasse 7
85232 Bergkirchen / DE
Former [2001/50]Hagemeier, Annette, Dr.
Patentanwältin, Mannertstrasse 18
80997 München / DE
Former [2001/49]Hagemeier, Annette, Dr.
Patentanwälte Walter, Eggers, Lindner, Sandgasse 117
93057 Regensburg / DE
Application number, filing date01113013.528.05.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateDE200012671430.05.2000         Original published format: DE 10026714
[2001/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1160075
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1160075
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1160075
Date:18.10.2006
Language:DE
[2006/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01B7/08, B32B7/04, B32B37/00, H05K3/28
[2006/42]
Former International [2002/01]H01B7/08, B32B7/04, B32B31/00, H05K3/28
Former International [2001/49]B32B27/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/49]
TitleGerman:Halogenfreier Folienverbund, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine Verwendung[2001/49]
English:Halogen-free composite film, process for its manufacture and its use[2001/49]
French:Feuille composite exempte d'halogène, procédé pour sa fabrication et son utilisation[2001/49]
Examination procedure24.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/14]
11.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.02.2006Fee for grant paid
15.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
05.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
18.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.10.2006
FI18.10.2006
IE18.10.2006
NL18.10.2006
TR18.10.2006
DK18.01.2007
GR19.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
LU28.05.2007
BE31.05.2007
MC31.05.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]CY18.10.2006
FI18.10.2006
IE18.10.2006
NL18.10.2006
DK18.01.2007
GR19.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
LU28.05.2007
BE31.05.2007
MC31.05.2007
Former [2008/19]FI18.10.2006
IE18.10.2006
NL18.10.2006
DK18.01.2007
GR19.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
BE31.05.2007
MC31.05.2007
Former [2008/09]FI18.10.2006
IE18.10.2006
NL18.10.2006
DK18.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
MC31.05.2007
Former [2007/42]FI18.10.2006
IE18.10.2006
NL18.10.2006
DK18.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/37]FI18.10.2006
NL18.10.2006
DK18.01.2007
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/26]FI18.10.2006
NL18.10.2006
PT19.03.2007
Former [2007/25]FI18.10.2006
NL18.10.2006
Former [2007/19]NL18.10.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0644560  (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-14,16-18,20-22 * page 5, columns 39-57; example -; claim - *;
 [XA]US4548661  (ESCALLIER EDWARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10,21,22 * column 3, line 18 - line 56 * * column 5, line 7 - line 16 * * column 6, line 1 - line 10; figures 1,3,8,12 * [A] 13-20;
 [XA]US3612743  (ANGELE WILHELM, et al) [X] 1-6,21-24 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 65 * * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 25; figures 1,2 * [A] 13-20;
 [XA]EP0208138  (GORE W L & CO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,21-24 * page 3 * * page 5, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * [A] 13-20;
 [X]US4075420  (WALTON TOMMY L) [X] 21,22 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS5567489