Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1162397

EP1162397 - Metal-composite corrugated hoses and a process for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2007
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DE
published on 12.09.2007  [2007/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD.
1, Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi
Aichi-ken, 485-8550 / JP
[2006/16]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd.
1, Higashi 3-chome
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken, 485-8550 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Katayama, Kazutaka
2-265 Chuo
Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken, 485-0029 / JP
02 / Hibino, Motoshige
1-9-21 Tajima-cho
Minokamo-shi, Gifu-ken, 505-0032 / JP
03 / Miyajima, Atsuo
10-12 Kamimaekawahara, Haguro
Inuyama-shi, Aichi-ken, 484-0894 / JP
04 / Ito, Hiroaki
7-3-30 Fujiyamadai
Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken, 487-0035 / JP
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Kuhnen & Wacker
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date01113023.428.05.2001
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateJP2000017199405.06.2000         Original published format: JP 2000171994
[2001/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1162397
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1162397
Date:26.03.2003
[2003/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1162397
Date:19.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:F16L11/15, B21D26/02
[2003/13]
Former International [2001/50]F16L11/15
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/51]
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gewellte Metallverbundschläuche und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[2001/50]
English:Metal-composite corrugated hoses and a process for manufacturing the same[2001/50]
French:Tuyaux ondulés en matières composites en métal et procédé de fabrication[2001/50]
Examination procedure23.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/30]
04.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2006Fee for grant paid
21.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB19.07.2006
DE01.12.2006
[2007/37]
Former [2007/28]GB19.07.2006
Documents cited:Search[ADY]JPH07275981  ;
 [YA]US5472746  (MIYAJIMA ATSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 9,10 * abstract * [A] 1;
 [A]AT404174B  (RHEINAUER MASCHINEN & ARMATURE [DE]) [A] 1-5 * page 3, line 47 - line 58; figure 1; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0890768  (BRUGG ROHRSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 22; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0673697  (BALCKE DUERR AG [DE]) [A] 6,8 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9958891  (LEE KARL O [US], et al) [A] 6 * page 19, line 22 - page 21, line 10 *
 [ADY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, [AD] 1-8 * abstract * [Y] 9,10
ExaminationEP1251000
by applicantJPH07275981