Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1170685

EP1170685 - IC card, settlement system and method with IC card [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.05.2014
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/06]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP
For all designated states
HITACHI CAPITAL CORPORATION
15-12, NISHISHINBASHI-2CHOME, MINATO-KU
TOKYO / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishibashi, Akira, c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
02 / Sakashita, Masahiro, c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
03 / Nakagawa, Masayuki, c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
04 / Yoda, Takao
Hitachi Capital Corp. 15-12 Nishishinbashi-2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-0003 / JP
05 / Takeda, Masashi
Hitachi Capital Corp. 15-12 Nishishinbashi-2-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-0003 / JP
 [2002/02]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2002/02]
Application number, filing date01113030.928.05.2001
[2002/02]
Priority number, dateJP2000019681329.06.2000         Original published format: JP 2000196813
[2002/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1170685
Date:09.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1170685
Date:03.03.2004
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/08, G06F17/60
[2004/01]
Former International [2002/02]G06F17/60, G07F7/10
Designated contracting statesDE [2004/48]
Former [2002/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Chipkarte, sowie Gerät und Verfahren zum Bezahlen mittels Chipkarte[2002/02]
English:IC card, settlement system and method with IC card[2002/02]
French:Carte de crédit associée, ainsi système et méthode de règlement par carte de crédit[2002/02]
Examination procedure24.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/21]
29.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/27]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.03.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
22.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
26.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9949424  (ORBIS PATENTS LIMITED ;DONNELL GRAHAM O (IE); FLITCROFT DANIEL IAN) [X] 1-6 * page 14, line 24 - page 15, line 30 * * page 39, line 9 - line 12 * * page 41, line 8 - line 26 *;
 [X]JPH11120244
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11120244 A 19990430 (NTT DATA CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract *