Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1160109

EP1160109 - Retaining device for a vehicle window pane [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wilhelm Karmann GmbH
Karmannstrasse 1
49084 Osnabrück / DE
[2007/08]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Wilhelm Karmann GmbH
Karmannstrasse 1
D-49084 Osnabrück / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hüdepohl, Stefan
Sledesenstrasse 14
49143 Bissendorf / DE
 [2001/49]
Representative(s)Busse & Busse
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26
49002 Osnabrück / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]Busse & Busse Patentanwälte
Postfach 12 26
49002 Osnabrück / DE
Application number, filing date01113113.329.05.2001
[2001/49]
Priority number, dateDE200012712731.05.2000         Original published format: DE 10027127
[2001/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1160109
Date:05.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1160109
Date:21.02.2007
Language:DE
[2007/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60J1/18
[2001/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/37]
Former [2002/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  LI 
Former [2001/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Haltevorrichtung für eine Fahrzeugscheibe[2001/49]
English:Retaining device for a vehicle window pane[2001/49]
French:Dispositif de fixation pour une vitre de fenêtre d'un véhicule[2001/49]
Examination procedure06.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/20]
06.06.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.10.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
27.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2006Fee for grant paid
09.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.08.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
01.08.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4210487  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19837411  (ASC INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2,5; claims 6,11 *;
 [A]DE4240281  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *