Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1161996

EP1161996 - Cuvette stand and stand with cuvettes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.09.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.11.2004  [2004/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kowa Company, Ltd.
6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460-0003 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]For all designated states
KOWA COMPANY LTD.
6-29, Nishiki 3-chome, Naka-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460-0003 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirono, Taisuke
Tsukuba-aibisukuea 402, Matsushiro 5-2-29
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken 305-0035 / JP
02 / Matsui, Hiroki
Nakagawa 4579-1, Hosoe-cho
Inasa-gun, Shizuoka-ken, 431-1304 / JP
 [2001/50]
Representative(s)Bauer, Wulf
Patentanwälte
Bauer Vorberg Kayser
Partnerschaft mbB
Goltsteinstrasse 87
50968 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/50]Bauer, Wulf, Dr.
Bayenthalgürtel 15
50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE
Application number, filing date01113342.801.06.2001
[2001/50]
Priority number, dateJP2000016858406.06.2000         Original published format: JP 2000168584
[2001/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1161996
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1161996
Date:06.08.2003
[2003/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:B01L9/06, G01N21/03
[2001/50]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/18]
Former [2001/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Ständer für Küvetten[2001/50]
English:Cuvette stand and stand with cuvettes[2001/50]
French:Support de cuvettes[2001/50]
Examination procedure07.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/45]
04.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.03.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
17.03.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.03.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4801428  (HOMOLKO JOHANNES [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 33 *;
 [X]US3175695  (GOODMAN DONALD E, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 24 *;
 [X]EP0953379  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 8 - line 26 *