Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1163856

EP1163856 - Perforating device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.05.2005
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.06.2005  [2005/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hauni Maschinenbau AG
Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32
21033 Hamburg / DE
[2001/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Dombek, Manfred
Meyersweg 24
21521 Dassendorf / DE
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date01113494.702.06.2001
[2001/51]
Priority number, dateDE200012884615.06.2000         Original published format: DE 10028846
[2001/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1163856
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1163856
Date:24.03.2004
[2004/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:A24C5/60, B23K26/02
[2004/13]
Former International [2001/51]A24C5/60
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/51]
Former [2001/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Perforationsvorrichtung[2001/51]
English:Perforating device[2001/51]
French:Dispositif de perforation[2001/51]
Examination procedure25.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/26]
21.01.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.11.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
03.11.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
03.11.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5148818  (ARTHUR HUGH M [GB]) [A] * column 2, line 2 - column 3, line 16; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4281670  (HEITMANN UWE, et al) [A] * column 12, line 20 - column 14, line 57; figure 13 *