Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1164097

EP1164097 - Device for advancing and rejecting blister packs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.03.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marchesini Group S.p.A.
Via Garganelli, 20 I-40065 Pian di Macina
Pianoro (Bologna) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
MARCHESINI GROUP S.p.A.
Via Garganelli, 20
I-40065 Pian di Macina Pianoro (Bologna) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Monti, Giuseppe
Via dello Sport 23
40065 Pianoro (Bologna) / IT
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Dall'Olio, Giancarlo
Invention S.r.l.
Via delle Armi 1
40137 Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Dall'Olio, Giancarlo
Invention S.r.l. Via delle Armi 1
40137 Bologna / IT
Former [2001/51]Dall'Olio, Giancarlo
c/o INVENTION s.a.s., Via delle Armi, 1
40137 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date01113606.615.06.2001
[2001/51]
Priority number, dateIT2000BO0035816.06.2000         Original published format: IT BO000358
[2001/51]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1164097
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65G47/78, B65G19/02
[2001/51]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/37]
Former [2001/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Förder- und Sortiervorrichtung für Blisterverpackungen[2001/51]
English:Device for advancing and rejecting blister packs[2001/51]
French:Dispositif de convoyage et de triage d'emballages blister[2001/51]
Examination procedure20.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/19]
02.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/19]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.09.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
05.09.2002TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
05.09.2002M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3211028  (CKD AG KOMAKI [JP]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * page 5, line 16 - page 7, paragraph 1; figure - *;
 [A]DE1184277  (SCHENCK GMBH CARL);
 [A]US2802560  (ENGLESON HARRY E, et al);
 [A]GB1372674  (MICHELS)