blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1168471

EP1168471 - Nickel electrode for alkaline storage battery and alkaline storage battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.11.2011
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.12.2011  [2011/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP
[2011/02]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd.
5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ogasawara, Takeshi
Sanyo Electric Co. Ltd., 5-5 Keihan-hondori
2-chome, Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP
02 / Tokuda, Mitsunori
Sanyo Electric Co. Ltd., 5-5 Keihan-hondori
2-chome, Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP
03 / Yano, Mutsumi
Sanyo Electric Co. Ltd., 5-5 Keihan-hondori
2-chome, Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date01113743.705.06.2001
[2002/01]
Priority number, dateJP2000019771630.06.2000         Original published format: JP 2000197716
JP2000035339220.11.2000         Original published format: JP 2000353392
JP2001009897230.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001098972
[2002/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1168471
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1168471
Date:12.01.2011
Language:EN
[2011/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2001
ClassificationIPC:H01M4/52, H01M4/32
[2002/01]
CPC:
H01M4/366 (EP,US); H01M10/26 (EP,US); H01M4/32 (EP,US);
H01M10/345 (EP,US); Y02E60/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/38]
Former [2002/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Nickelelektrode für alkalische Speicherbatterie und alkalische Speicherbatterie[2002/01]
English:Nickel electrode for alkaline storage battery and alkaline storage battery[2002/01]
French:Electrode de nickel pour accumulateur alcalin et accumulateur alcalin[2002/01]
Examination procedure13.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/22]
07.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2010Fee for grant paid
23.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
20.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
24.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
23.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH10125318  ;
 [A]EP0789408  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 2, line 51 - page 3, line 32 * * page 3, line 58 - page 4, line 54 * * examples 1-3,7 * * claims 1-3,5-8,10,11,13 *;
 [A]EP0881698  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,6-8,12-14 * page 4, paragraphs 1-3 * * examples 1,2 ** claims 1-4 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10125318 A 19980515 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,4,5,12 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.