Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1264839

EP1264839 - Method for separating protein mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ProteoSys AG
Kupferbergterrasse 17-19
55116 Mainz / DE
[2002/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Wozny, Wojciech
Gutenbergstrasse 14
55268 Nieder Olm / DE
02 / Cahill, Michael A.
Duererstrasse 20
72116 Mössingen / DE
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Kronenstrasse 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Kronenstrasse 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date01113909.407.06.2001
[2002/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1264839
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/26, C07K1/28, C07K1/36
[2002/50]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/36]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Abtrennung von Proteinmischungen[2002/50]
English:Method for separating protein mixtures[2002/50]
French:Méthode pour la séparation de mélanges de protéines[2002/50]
Examination procedure12.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/13]
09.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.07.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
18.07.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
18.07.2003M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0107920  (BIO RAD LABORATORIES [US]) [X] 1-16 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 33 * * page 6, line 3 - page 9, line 18 *;
 [X]WO9214747  (ASTROMED LTD [GB]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *