EP1168311 - Objective lens, optical pickup device and optical recording/reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Ikuya Corp.Res.and Dev.Lab., Pioneer Corp., 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Makoto Corp.Res.and Dev.Lab., Pioneer Corp., 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 03 /
Koike, Katsuhiro Corp.Res.and Dev.Lab., Pioneer Corp., 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 04 /
Maeda, Takanori Corp.Res.and Dev.Lab., Pioneer Corp., 6-1-1 Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113985.4 | 08.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | JP20000175229 | 12.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000175229 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1168311 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1168311 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1168311 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135, G11B7/22, G02B13/18 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
G11B7/1374 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | G11B7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/36] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Objektivlinse, optische Abtastvorrichtung und optisches Aufnahme/Wiedergabegerät | [2002/01] | English: | Objective lens, optical pickup device and optical recording/reproducing apparatus | [2002/01] | French: | Lentille d'objectif, tête optique et appareil d'enregistrement et/ou lecture optique | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 23.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5805355 (NATSUNO YASUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0840156 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |