Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254680

EP1254680 - Flashback blood collection needle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.06.2009
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes
New Jersey 07417 / US
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Becton, Dickinson and Company
1 Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Leong, Alvin Tan Chee
Block 516, Bedok North Ave 2, 19-131
Singapore 460516 / SG
 [2007/32]
Former [2002/45]01 / Leong, Alvin Tan Chee
Block 516, Bedok North Ave 2, #19-131
Singapore 460516 / SG
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date01114184.312.06.2001
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateUS2001084773202.05.2001         Original published format: US 847732
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254680
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254680
Date:13.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/06
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
TitleGerman:Rückflussblut-Sammelnadel[2002/45]
English:Flashback blood collection needle[2002/45]
French:Aiguille de prelèvement de sang avec reflux sanguin[2002/45]
Examination procedure02.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/22]
16.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2008Fee for grant paid
16.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08162171.6  / EP1992384
Opposition(s)14.05.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
CY13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
TR13.08.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2010/47]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SE13.11.2008
GR14.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2010/09]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
SE13.11.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2009/25]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
PT13.01.2009
Former [2009/19]AT13.08.2008
BE13.08.2008
DK13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
Former [2009/15]AT13.08.2008
FI13.08.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]US4444203  (ENGELMAN ALLAN [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 62; figure 2 *;
 [X]EP0619096  (SUZUKI ISSEI [JP], et al) [X] 1,11 * figures 15,16 *;
 [X]US5450856  (NORRIS WENDAL A [US]) [X] 1,11 * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 46; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]US3817240  (AYRES W) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9903417  (MEDICAL COMPONENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *