Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1170862

EP1170862 - Piezoelectric resonator and piezoelectric filter using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.08.2013
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 11.06.2014  [2014/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP
[2007/37]
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shibata, Akihiko, (A170) Int. Property Dept.
Murata Manufact. Co.,Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
02 / Takeuchi, Masaki, (A170) Int. Property Dept.
Murata Manufact. Co.,Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
03 / Tsukai, Norimitsu, (A170) Int. Property Dept.
Murata Manufact. Co.,Ltd.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
 [2012/41]
Former [2002/02]01 / Shibata, Akihiko, (A170) Int. Property Dept.
Murata Manufact. Co.,Ltd., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
02 / Takeuchi, Masaki, (A170) Int. Property Dept.
Murata Manufact. Co.,Ltd., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
03 / Tsukai, Norimitsu, (A170) Int. Property Dept.
Murata Manufact. Co.,Ltd., 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[2012/41]
Former [2009/29]Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2002/02]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date01114466.415.06.2001
[2002/02]
Priority number, dateJP2000018912523.06.2000         Original published format: JP 2000189125
JP2000026283831.08.2000         Original published format: JP 2000262838
JP2000037113506.12.2000         Original published format: JP 2000371135
[2002/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1170862
Date:09.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1170862
Date:13.02.2002
[2002/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1170862
Date:10.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2002
ClassificationInternational:H03H9/02, H03H9/56, H03H9/17
[2012/14]
Former International [2002/02]H03H9/17, H03H9/58
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/44]
Former [2002/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Piezoelektrischer Resonator und diesen enthaltendes piezoelektrisches Filter[2002/02]
English:Piezoelectric resonator and piezoelectric filter using the same[2002/02]
French:Résonateur piézoélectrique et filtre piézoélectrique comprenant le même[2002/02]
Examination procedure15.06.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
02.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2012Fee for grant paid
22.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.08.2007
Opposition(s)11.07.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
06.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
30.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
28.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR01.07.2013
[2014/24]
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0680142  (TOYO COMMUNICATION EQUIP [JP]) [Y] 1,4,5 * page 9, lines 38-54 * * page 16, lines 45-48 * * page 8, line 47 - page 9, line 16; figures 6,11-14 * [A] 7,9,13;
 [YA]US4456850  (INOUE TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4,5 * the whole document * [A] 7,10-13,18;
 [A]US4642508  (SUZUKI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5382930  (STOKES ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 19,20 * column 1, lines 14-17 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 4; figure 2 *
Examination   - LAKIN K M ET AL, "Stacked crystal filters implemented with thin films", 19890531; 19890531 - 19890602, (19890531), pages 536 - 543, XP010084296
by applicantEP0680142
 US4456850
    - LAKIN K.M. ET AL., "Stacked crystal filters implemented with thin films", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS ARTICLE, (19890531), pages 536 - 543