Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1145729

EP1145729 - A ready-to-use urinary catheter assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 26.09.2018  [2018/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coloplast A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
[2017/50]
Former [2001/42]For all designated states
COLOPLAST A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Kayerod, Helle
Skodsborgvej 238
2850 Naerum / DK
02 / Nosted, Ulrik
Willemoesgade 34 3.th.
2100 Copenhagen / DK
03 / Tanghoj, Allan
Jellerod Have 59
2980 Kokkedal / DK
04 / Torstensen, Jan
Egelovsvej 30
2830 Virum / DK
 [2003/19]
Former [2002/02]01 / Kayerod, Helle
Skodsborgvej 238
2850 Naerumagen / DK
02 / Nosted, Ulrik
Willemoesgade 34 3.th.
2100 Copenhagen / DK
03 / Tanghoj, Allan
Jellerod Have 59
2980 Kokkedal / DK
04 / Torstensen, Jan
Egelovsvej 30
2830 Virum / DK
Former [2001/50]01 / Kayerod, Helle
Stefansgade 56
2200 Copenhagen N / DK
02 / Nosted, Ulrik
Willemoesgade 34 3.th.
2100 Copenhagen / DK
03 / Tanghoj, Allan
Jellerod Have 59
2980 Kokkedal / DK
04 / Torstensen, Jan
Egelovsvej 30
2830 Virum / DK
Former [2001/48]01 / Kayerod, Helle
Stefansgade 56
2200 Copenhagen N / DK
02 / Nosted, Ulrik
Agnetevej 2
2800 Lyngby / DK
03 / Tanghoj, Allan
Jellerod Have 59
2980 Kokkedal / DK
04 / Torstensen, Jan
Egelovsvej 30
2830 Virum / DK
Former [2001/42]01 / Keyerod, Helle
Stefansgade 56
2200 Copenhagen N / DK
02 / Nosted, Ulrik
Agnetevej 2
2800 Lyngby / DK
03 / Tanghoj, Allan
Jellerod Have 59
2980 Kokkedal / DK
04 / Torstensen, Jan
Egelovsvej 30
2830 Virum / DK
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2017/50]
Former [2008/37]Inspicos A/S
Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45
2970 Hørsholm / DK
Former [2004/52]Inspicos A/S
Böge Allé 5 P.O. Box 45
2970 Hörsholm / DK
Former [2004/01]Inspicos A/S
Böge Allé 3, P.O. Box 45
2970 Hörsholm / DK
Former [2003/18]Nilausen, Kim
c/o Coloplast A/S, Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
Former [2001/42]Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners A/S
Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007
1021 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date01114582.818.09.1997
[2001/42]
Priority number, dateDK1996000102318.09.1996         Original published format: DK 102396
DK1996000122401.11.1996         Original published format: DK 122496
[2001/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1145729
Date:17.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1145729
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1145729
Date:13.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/00, A61M25/01
[2001/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2017/50]
Former [2001/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein gebrauchsfertiges Blasenkatheterset[2001/42]
English:A ready-to-use urinary catheter assembly[2001/42]
French:Ensemble cathéter urinaire prêt à l'emploi[2005/17]
Former [2001/42]Ensemble cathéter urinaire pret à l'emploi
Examination procedure17.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/25]
07.05.2003Observations by third parties
22.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.09.2005Fee for grant paid
07.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97918923.0  / EP0923398
Divisional application(s)EP05025319.4  / EP1642611
EP05027157.6  / EP1642610
EP05027158.4  / EP1647298
EP10164118.1  / EP2216064
EP10180787.3  / EP2258435
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Stoll, Christian, et al
Hogan Lovells
International LLP
Alstertor 21
20095 Hamburg / DE
 02  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Høiberg P/S, et al
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
 03  22.08.2006  06.01.2009  WITHDRAWN
Willy Rüsch GmbH
Willy-Rüsch-Str. 4-10
71394 Kernen-Rommelshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hedges, Martin Nicholas
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
 04  23.01.2015  28.01.2015  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Kain-Märk Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Sonnenweg 7
2551 Enzesfeld-Lindabrunn / AT
Opponent's representative
Holme Patent A/S
Valbygårdsvej 33
2500 Valby / DK
 05  26.03.2015  27.03.2015  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Medical4You B.V.
Wilhelminalaan 41
6641 JA Beuningen / NL
Opponent's representative
Holme Patent A/S
Valbygårdsvej 33
2500 Valby / DK
 [N/P]
Former [2016/42]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Stoll, Christian, et al
Hogan Lovells
International LLP
Alstertor 21
DE-20095 Hamburg / DE
 02  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Høiberg A/S, et al
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
 03  22.08.2006  06.01.2009  WITHDRAWN
Willy Rüsch GmbH
Willy-Rüsch-Str. 4-10
71394 Kernen-Rommelshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hedges, Martin Nicholas
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
 04  23.01.2015  28.01.2015  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Kain-Märk Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Sonnenweg 7
2551 Enzesfeld-Lindabrunn / AT
Opponent's representative
Holme Patent A/S
Valbygårdsvej 33
2500 Valby / DK
 05  26.03.2015  27.03.2015  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Medical4You B.V.
Wilhelminalaan 41
6641 JA Beuningen / NL
Opponent's representative
Holme Patent A/S
Valbygårdsvej 33
2500 Valby / DK
Former [2016/29]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Stoll, Christian, et al
Hogan Lovells
International LLP
Alstertor 21
DE-20095 Hamburg / DE
 02  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Elmeros, Claus, et al
Høiberg A/S
Adelgade 12
DK-1304 Copenhagen K / DK
 03  22.08.2006  06.01.2009  WITHDRAWN
Willy Rüsch GmbH
Willy-Rüsch-Str. 4-10
71394 Kernen-Rommelshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hedges, Martin Nicholas
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
 04  23.01.2015  28.01.2015  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Kain-Märk Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Sonnenweg 7
2551 Enzesfeld-Lindabrunn / AT
Opponent's representative
Holme Patent A/S
Valbygårdsvej 33
2500 Valby / DK
 05  26.03.2015  27.03.2015  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Medical4You B.V.
Wilhelminalaan 41
6641 JA Beuningen / NL
Opponent's representative
Holme Patent A/S
Valbygårdsvej 33
2500 Valby / DK
Former [2015/15]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Stoll, Christian, et al
Hogan Lovells
International LLP
Alstertor 21
DE-20095 Hamburg / DE
 02  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Elmeros, Claus, et al
Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
 03  22.08.2006  06.01.2009  WITHDRAWN
Willy Rüsch GmbH
Willy-Rüsch-Str. 4-10
71394 Kernen-Rommelshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hedges, Martin Nicholas
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
 04  23.01.2015  28.01.2015  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Kain-Märk Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Sonnenweg 7
2551 Enzesfeld-Lindabrunn / AT
Opponent's representative
Holme Patent A/S
Valbygårdsvej 33
2500 Valby / DK
Former [2015/14]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Anderson, Robert J., et al
Hogan Lovells
International LLP
Atlantic House
65 Holborn Viaduct
GB-London EC1A 2FG / GB
 02  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Elmeros, Claus, et al
Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
 03  22.08.2006  06.01.2009  WITHDRAWN
Willy Rüsch GmbH
Willy-Rüsch-Str. 4-10
71394 Kernen-Rommelshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hedges, Martin Nicholas
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
 04  23.01.2015  28.01.2015  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
Kain-Märk Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Sonnenweg 7
2551 Enzesfeld-Lindabrunn / AT
Opponent's representative
Holme Patent A/S
Valbygårdsvej 33
2500 Valby / DK
Former [2015/10]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Anderson, Robert J., et al
Hogan Lovells
International LLP
Atlantic House
65 Holborn Viaduct
GB-London EC1A 2FG / GB
 02  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Elmeros, Claus, et al
Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
 03  22.08.2006  06.01.2009  WITHDRAWN
Willy Rüsch GmbH
Willy-Rüsch-Str. 4-10
71394 Kernen-Rommelshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hedges, Martin Nicholas
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
 04  23.01.2015  28.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Kain-Märk Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Sonnenweg 7
2551 Enzesfeld-Lindabrunn / AT
Opponent's representative
Holme Patent A/S
Valbygårdsvej 33
2500 Valby / DK
Former [2011/51]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Anderson, Robert J., et al
Hogan Lovells
International LLP
Atlantic House
65 Holborn Viaduct
GB-London EC1A 2FG / GB
 02  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Elmeros, Claus, et al
Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
 03  22.08.2006  06.01.2009  WITHDRAWN
Willy Rüsch GmbH
Willy-Rüsch-Str. 4-10
71394 Kernen-Rommelshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hedges, Martin Nicholas
A.A. Thornton & Co.
235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Former [2009/08]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Anderson, Robert J., et al
LOVELLS Atlantic House Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2FG / GB
 02  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Elmeros, Claus, et al
Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
 03  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  WITHDRAWN
Willy Rüsch GmbH
Willy-Rüsch-Str. 4-10
71394 Kernen-Rommelshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hedges, Martin Nicholas
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Former [2008/01]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Anderson, Robert J., et al
LOVELLS Atlantic House Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2FG / GB
 02  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Elmeros, Claus, et al
Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
 03  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Willy Rüsch GmbH
Willy-Rüsch-Str. 4-10
71394 Kernen-Rommelshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hedges, Martin Nicholas
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Former [2007/12]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Anderson, Robert J., et al
LOVELLS Atlantic House Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2FG / GB
 02  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al
Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S Vester Sögade 10
1601 Copenhagen V / DK
 03  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Willy Rüsch GmbH
Willy-Rüsch-Str. 4-10
71394 Kernen-Rommelshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Hedges, Martin Nicholas
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Former [2006/40]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Anderson, Robert J., et al
LOVELLS Atlantic House Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2FG / GB
 02  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al
Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S Vester Sögade 10
1601 Copenhagen V / DK
 03  22.08.2006  31.08.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Willy Rüsch GmbH
Willy-Rüsch-Str. 4-10
71394 Kernen-Rommelshausen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kuhnen, Rainer-Andreas, et al
KUHNEN & WACKER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Postfach 19 64
85319 Freising / DE
Former [2006/39]
Opponent(s)01  21.08.2006   
Hollister Limited
21 Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2DY / GB
Opponent's representative
Anderson, Robert J., et al
LOVELLS Atlantic House Holborn Viaduct
London EC1A 2FG / GB
 02  22.08.2006   
Dansac A/S
Lille Kongevej 304
3480 Fredensborg / DK
Opponent's representative
Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al
Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S Vester Sögade 10
1601 Copenhagen V / DK
27.09.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.06.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.11.2008Date of oral proceedings
11.12.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
18.01.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.01.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
11.05.2015Date of oral proceedings
08.07.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.07.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.02.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.10.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
30.10.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition12.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1477/15
18.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
23.02.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
27.05.2015Appeal received No.  T1477/15
18.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
23.02.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
11.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1477/15
16.11.2015Statement of grounds filed
23.02.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
16.09.2015Appeal received No.  T1477/15
16.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
23.02.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
27.03.2013Appeal received No.  T0801/13
28.05.2013Statement of grounds filed
27.02.2014Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
20.02.2009Appeal received No.  T0468/09
21.04.2009Statement of grounds filed
28.09.2011Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
28.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
10.10.2011Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
27.02.2014Date of oral proceedings
05.03.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
23.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.02.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Petition(s) for review:05.10.2017Petition for review received
 Number:  R0008/17
 for appeal No.  T1477/15-3202
 Petitioner:  OP01
18.06.2018Decision:  Petition for review obviously inadmissible (not deemed to be filed) or simultaneously obviously inadmissible and obviously unsubstantiated.
18.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
08.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
15.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
PT23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
IE18.09.2006
LU18.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
GB17.09.2017
ES19.09.2017
[2018/39]
Former [2018/01]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
PT23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
IE18.09.2006
LU18.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
GB17.09.2017
Former [2015/21]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
PT23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
IE18.09.2006
LU18.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2008/37]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
IE18.09.2006
LU18.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/45]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
IE18.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/42]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
IT23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
IE18.09.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/37]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
IT23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
MC30.09.2006
Former [2007/36]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
IT23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
Former [2006/38]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
GR23.02.2006
Former [2006/36]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
Former [2006/23]FI23.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]US3967728  (GORDON ROBERT L, et al) [A] 1-4,7,8,19 * figure -; claim - *;
 [PA]WO9630277  (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [PA] 1-6,10,13 * page 5, line 33 - page 8, line 35; figure - *;
 [DA]US3648704  (JACKSON FREDERICK E) [DA] 1-4,7,8 * column A; figure - *;
 [DA]WO9416747  (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5226530  (GOLDEN JOHN H [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure - *
by applicantEP0217771
 EP0586324
 WO9416747
 US3035691
 US3648704
 US3967728
 US4204527
 US4269310
otherDE9411281U
 DE4424586
 DE19646401
 DE10052364
OppositionCN1106744
 JPS5512265
 US2947415
 WO9630277
 US5454798
 GB2284764
 WO9406377
 WO9726937
 US4863016
 WO9416747
 US3648704
 US5226530
 US3967728
 WO8606284
 DE2317839
 EP0586324
 EP0217771
 WO0030696
 US4026296
 EP2060296
 EP0923398
 WO9310163
 US5540033
 EP0680895
 EP0612504
 WO9623601
 EP0923398
 EP0935478
    - EN-Translation of D1 provided by opponent 1
    - EN-Translation of D1 provided by opponent 2
    - EN-Translation of D1 provided by opponent 3
    - EN-Translation of D2 provided by opponent 1
    - EN-Translation of D2 provided by opponent 2
    - EN-Translation of D2 provided by opponent 3
    - Report of Ann Winder (13.09.05)
    - Leaflet "The LoFric Strory"
    - Report of Mogens Svanum (15.09.05)
    - Nursing Times (17.09.86)
    - "LoFric" brochure
    - Coloplast's Notice and Grounds of Opposition to AU 706 432 (WO-A-97/26937)
    - Priodoc. DK 1023/96 (18.09.1996)
    - Priodoc. DK 1224/96 (01.11.1996)
    - Submission dated 02.12.2004, in the matter of EP 97 918 923/0 923 398
    - Priodoc. SE 9600276-1
    - Second Expert Report of Mogens Svanum (19.10.2005)
    - Polymers in Medicine and Surgery (1975, A Hoffmann, pp. 33-44)
    - Patentee's ground of appeal in the parent Patent Proceedings EP 0 923 398
    - Polymers: Biomaterial and Medical Applications (1989, Kroschmitz, pp. 228-275)
    - Patentee's Brochure for the EasiCath Set
    - Excerpt from a brochure published by the patentee in 1998/99
    - Print-out from the link http://www.chemindustry.com/19616.html
    - Excerpt from Aldrich Handbook of Fine Chemicals
    - Response to Opponent's observation in the case T1574/05
    - Solemn declaration of Prof. K. Almdal
    - Excerpts from Oxfords Dictionary relating to the term "moisture" and "confine"
    - Introduction to Humidity - Basics principles on Physics of Water Vapor
    - Plasdone® Povidone - product guide
    - O'BRIEN J.D., Medical Device Packaging Handbook, NEW YORK, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (1990), pages 86-90 - 118-122 139-140
    - Excerpt from Red Cross and Red Crescent Emergency Item Catalogue; Item: Catheter, Urinary, Female, CH12
    - Patient.co.uk -Intermittent Self-Catheterisation
    - Expert opinion of Prof. S.B. Jørgensen, emeritus professor in Chemical Engineering at the Technical University of Denmark
    - Proprietor's opposition against EP-B-910425
    - Lofric® Cath-kit- Brochure from AstraTech
    - ASTM Standard No. F1249-90
    - ISO Standard No. 15106-2
    - ABDEL-BARY E.M., Handbook of Plastics Films, RAPRA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED, (2003), pages 34-35 - 243-244; 348-349
    - Permeability Properties of Plastics and Elastomers. A Guide to Packaging and Barrier Materials. Second Edition.
    - Flexofoil Packaging PVT LTD, "Barrier Propertiesof Films", retrieved from www.flexifoibackaging.com/barrier-properties-films
    - Preliminary opinion of the BPatG dated 25.10.2013
    - Chapter 6 of "Clinical Management of Complicated Urinary Tract Infection", book edited by Ahmad Nikibasksh, Published: September 6, 2011