EP1143482 - Multiple reflection electrodeless lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUSION LIGHTING, INC. 7524 Standish Place Rockville, MD 20855 / US | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maclennan, Donald A. 107 Rittswood Drive Butler, PA 16001 / US | 02 /
Turner, Brian 10235 Crosscut Way Damascus, MD 20782 / US | 03 /
Kipling, Kent 20332 Pleasant Ridge Drive Gaithersburg, MD 20879 / US | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114807.9 | 29.05.1997 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | US19960656381 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: US 656381 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1143482 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1143482 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/12, H01J61/18, H01J61/35, H01J61/42, H01J61/38, H01J17/16, H01J17/20, H05B41/24 | [2001/41] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | Elektrodenlose Mehrfachreflektionslampe | [2001/50] | English: | Multiple reflection electrodeless lamp | [2001/41] | French: | Lampe à reflexion multiple sans électrode | [2001/41] |
Former [2001/41] | Mehrfachreflektion elektrodelose Lampe | Examination procedure | 06.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 12.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97928997.2 / EP0902965 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4071798 (HAMMOND THOMAS J) [Y] 1-16 * column 2, line 3 - column 2, line 39; figure 1 *; | [A]US4501993 (MUELLER PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-16* column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 39; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4532427 (MATTHEWS JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 7, line 24 - column 8, line 23; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US4950059 (ROBERTS VICTOR D [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 2, line 18 - column 5, line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4978891 (URY MICHAEL G [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 46; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0541344 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 5, line 40 - column 13, line 29; figures 1-4 *; | [YD]USRE34492E (ROBERTS VICTOR D [US]) [YD] 1-16 * column 3, line 18 - column 5, line 10; figures 1-5 *; | [AD]WO9408439 (FUSION SYSTEMS CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * page 13, line 7 - page 28, line 20; figures 1A-11 *; | [AD]US5404076 (DOLAN JAMES T [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 44; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9510847 (FUSION LIGHTING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 3, line 26 - page 7, line 9; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]WO9528069 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [AD] 1-16 * page 7, line 5 - page 11, line 32; figures 1-3C *; | [Y]US5504391 (TURNER BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 21; figures 2-5,8,9 *; | [Y]US5514932 (WILLIBRORDUS PUENT F J [NL], et al) [Y] 5-16 * column 3, line 29 - column 3, line 31; figures 1-3 * |