Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1167885

EP1167885 - Radiating element for heat and/or cold [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vollmer, H., Dr.Ing.
Zusenhofener Strasse 21a
77704 Oberkirch-Nussbach / DE
[2002/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Maucher, Wolfgang , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät
Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen
Urachstrasse 23
79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Maucher, Wolfgang , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23
79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE
Former [2002/01]Maucher, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät, PA Dipl.-Ing. W. Maucher, PA und RA H. Börjes-Pestalozza, Dreikönigstrasse 13
79102 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date01114821.027.06.2001
[2002/01]
Priority number, dateDE200013198030.06.2000         Original published format: DE 10031980
[2002/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1167885
Date:02.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1167885
Date:13.11.2002
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:F24D3/16
[2002/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/01]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Strahlelement zum Abstrahlen von Wärme und/oder Kälte[2003/04]
English:Radiating element for heat and/or cold[2002/01]
French:Elément radiant pour chaleur et/ou froid[2002/01]
Former [2002/01]Strahelement zum Abstrahlen von Wärme und/oder Kälte
Examination procedure14.01.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/11]
Documents cited:Search[A]DE963645  (ALBRECHT KOLLMAR DR ING) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2042428  (SCHNEIDER ANTON [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *
by applicantEP0360097
 EP0501443