Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1167156

EP1167156 - Nestable shopping cart [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.2006
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK GMBH
Postfach 1129
D-89336 Leipheim / DE
[2002/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Eberlein, Herbert
Beethovenstrasse 8
89347 Bubesheim / DE
 [2002/01]
Application number, filing date01115064.621.06.2001
[2002/01]
Priority number, dateDE2000211117U23.06.2000         Original published format: DE 20011117 U
[2002/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1167156
Date:02.01.2002
Language:DE
[2002/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1167156
Date:18.06.2003
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1167156
Date:22.02.2006
Language:DE
[2006/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B62B3/18, B62B3/04
[2002/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/01]
TitleGerman:Stapelbarer Einkaufswagen[2002/01]
English:Nestable shopping cart[2002/01]
French:Chariot libre-service emboîtable[2002/01]
Examination procedure09.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/28]
02.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2005Fee for grant paid
27.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.02.2006
FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
TR22.02.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
GR23.05.2006
AT21.06.2006
LU21.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
CH30.06.2006
LI30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/37]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
TR22.02.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
GR23.05.2006
AT21.06.2006
LU21.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
CH30.06.2006
LI30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2008/19]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
GR23.05.2006
AT21.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
CH30.06.2006
LI30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2007/50]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
AT21.06.2006
BE30.06.2006
CH30.06.2006
LI30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2007/45]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
BE30.06.2006
CH30.06.2006
LI30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2007/36]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
IT22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
BE30.06.2006
CH30.06.2006
LI30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2007/30]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
BE30.06.2006
CH30.06.2006
LI30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2007/28]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
BE30.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2007/09]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
MC30.06.2006
PT24.07.2006
Former [2007/07]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
MC30.06.2006
Former [2006/51]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
DK22.05.2006
SE22.05.2006
Former [2006/48]FI22.02.2006
IE22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
SE22.05.2006
Former [2006/45]FI22.02.2006
NL22.02.2006
SE22.05.2006
Former [2006/36]FI22.02.2006
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP0254210  (WANZL KG RUDOLF [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0679562  (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0684176  (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *
by applicantEP0254210