blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1167799

EP1167799 - Ball-ramp-actuated friction clutch activated via magnetically controlled shear [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2006
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2007Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT
published on 07.11.2007  [2007/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eaton Corporation
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
[2006/06]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
EATON CORPORATION
Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Stretch, Dale Arden
13955 Berwick
Livonia, Michigan 48154 / US
02 / Spring, James Keving
6356 Chaparral Dive
Brighton, Michigan 48116 / US
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Bauerstraße 22
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Schwan - Schwan - Schorer
Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Elfenstrasse 32
81739 München / DE
Application number, filing date01115173.522.06.2001
[2002/01]
Priority number, dateUS2000060415627.06.2000         Original published format: US 604156
[2002/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1167799
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1167799
Date:08.10.2003
[2003/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1167799
Date:08.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2003
ClassificationIPC:B60K17/346, F16D47/04, F16D37/00
[2003/40]
CPC:
F16D47/04 (EP,US); F16D35/00 (KR); F16D37/02 (EP,US);
F16D2037/005 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2002/01]F16D37/00, F16D47/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/27]
Former [2002/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Reibungskupplung mit mittels magnetisch gesteuerter Scherung aktivierter Kugelauflaufbetätigung[2002/01]
English:Ball-ramp-actuated friction clutch activated via magnetically controlled shear[2002/01]
French:Embrayage à friction actionné par dispositif à billes et rampes activé par cisaillement à commande magnétique[2002/01]
Examination procedure29.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/14]
23.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2005Fee for grant paid
07.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
04.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2007/45]
Former [2007/36]IT08.02.2006
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0899475  (BORG WARNER AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5,7-12;
 [Y]DE1119064  (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 33 - line 51 *;
 [YA]US2900343  (ROY BARNS ROBERT LEE, et al) [Y] 5 * column W * [A] 3,4,6;
 [YA]US5967276  (LEICHLITER WAYNE K [US], et al) [Y] 7-12 * column W * [A] 1,6,13,14;
 [XA]US5322484  (REUTER DAVID C [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column A; figure 1 * * column 4, line 1 - line 33; figure 4 * [A] 9-11;
 [XA]DE19847621  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * the whole document * [A] 9-11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.