Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1167003

EP1167003 - Method of making a pneumatic tire having a tread belt [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.08.2005
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD.
6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD.
6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanaka, Masatoshi
Sumitomo Rubber Ind., 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome
Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
 [2002/01]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2002/01]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Gbr
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Application number, filing date01115316.025.06.2001
[2002/01]
Priority number, dateJP2000019144226.06.2000         Original published format: JP 2000191442
[2002/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1167003
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1167003
Date:18.06.2003
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:B29D30/30, B29D30/70, B29D30/16, B29D30/60, B60C9/20, B60C9/26
[2003/25]
Former International [2002/01]B29D30/30, B29D30/70
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/13]
Former [2004/11]
Former [2002/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Luftreifens mit einer Gürtelbandage[2002/01]
English:Method of making a pneumatic tire having a tread belt[2002/01]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un pneumatique à ceinture[2002/01]
Examination procedure14.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/13]
12.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/38]
22.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200505   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5441093  (SHIRASYOUJI HISASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 34 - line 60 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 48 * * abstract *;
 [X]JPH04339002  ;
 [X]US4201260  (MIRTAIN HENRI J [FR], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 62 * * abstract *;
 [X]GB1569640  (UNIROYAL INC, et al) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 21 - line 74 * * figures 1-4; claims 1,17 *;
 [X]EP0850788  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 5 - line 12 * * page 3, line 32 - line 46 * * abstract *;
 [X]EP0887208  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 8 - line 30 * * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 5 * * page 3, line 44 - line 50 * * abstract *;
 [X]US3422874  (WEITZEL EDWARD W) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 14 - line 27 * * column 2, line 69 - column 3, line 29 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [E]EP1260385  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [E] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] * * abstract *;
 [A]DE3535064  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * abstract *;
 [A]EP0698510  (SP REIFENWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930412), vol. 017, no. 186, Database accession no. (M - 1395), [X] 1-6 * abstract *